MANAGERS (10)
Season | Name | Obs. Season | Division | Pos. | Fullname | Birthdate | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1948-49 | 1. Bundesliga | 3 |
|
||||
1949-50 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 5 | ||||
1950-51 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 8 | ||||
1951-52 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 5 | ||||
1952-53 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 5 | ||||
1953-54 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 6 | ||||
1954-55 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 6 | ||||
1955-56 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 9 | ||||
1956-57 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 8 | ||||
1957-58 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 10 | ||||
1958-59 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 12 | ||||
1959-60 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 14 | ||||
1961-62 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 3 | ||||
1962-63 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 2 | ||||
1963-64 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 7 | ||||
1964-65 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 3 | ||||
1965-66 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 1 | ||||
1966-67 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 7 | ||||
1967-68 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 9 | ||||
1968-69 | 1. Bundesliga | 8 |
|
15/01/1920 |
|||
1969-70 | 1. Bundesliga | 10 |
|
15/01/1920 |
|||
1970-71 | 1. Bundesliga | 7 |
|
15/01/1920 |
|||
1971-72 | 1. Bundesliga | 13 |
|
07/03/1926 |
|||
1972-73 | 1. Bundesliga | 4 |
|
07/03/1926 |
|||
1973-74 | 1. Bundesliga | 7 |
|
07/03/1926 |
|||
1974-75 | 1. Bundesliga | 8 |
|
07/03/1926 |
|||
1975-76 | 1. Bundesliga | 5 |
|
||||
1976-77 | 1. Bundesliga | 6 |
|
06/11/1925 |
|||
1977-78 |
1--19 20--36 |
1. Bundesliga | 9 |
|
04/12/1945 19/01/1919 |
||
1978-79 |
1--36 |
1. Bundesliga | 7 |
|
01/02/1942 21/02/1922 |
||
1979-80 | 1. Bundesliga | 7 |
|
01/02/1942 |
|||
1980-81 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 4 | ||||
1981-82 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 4 | ||||
1982-83 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 10 | ||||
1983-84 | MD |
1. Bundesliga | 6 | ||||
1984-85 | 1. Bundesliga | 5 |
|
24/04/1947 |
|||
1985-86 | 1. Bundesliga | 8 |
|
24/04/1947 |