MANAGERS (13)
Season | Name | Obs. Season | Division | Pos. | Fullname | Birthdate | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1965-66 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
10/12/1903 |
|||
1966-67 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
10/12/1903 |
|||
1967-68 | MD |
Division 1 | 2 | ||||
1968-69 | MD |
Division 1 | 2 | ||||
1969-70 | Division 1 | 3 |
|
03/12/1923 |
|||
1970-71 | Division 1 | 7 |
|
29/08/1932 12/03/1926 |
|||
1971-72 | Division 1 | 2 |
|
0/05/1928 |
|||
1972-73 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
29/08/1932 |
|||
1973-74 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
29/08/1932 |
|||
1974-75 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
29/08/1932 12/03/1926 |
|||
1975-76 | Division 1 | 3 |
|
23/10/1915 12/03/1926 |
|||
1976-77 | Division 1 | 2 |
|
12/03/1926 |
|||
1977-78 | Division 1 | 4 |
|
22/10/1930 |
|||
1978-79 | Division 1 | 2 |
|
22/10/1930 |
|||
1979-80 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
22/10/1930 |
|||
1980-81 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
02/03/1921 |
|||
1981-82 | Division 1 | 1 |
|
||||
1982-83 | MD |
Division 1 | 1 | ||||
1983-84 | Division 1 | 2 |
|
11/08/1938 |
|||
1984-85 |
1--25 |
Division 1 | 4 |
|
23/09/1932 |
||
1985-86 | Division 1 | 5 |
|
23/04/1929 |